Senate | 06/05/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/31/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/30/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Public Act 13-71 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2013 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/22/2013 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | House Calendar Number 441 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | File Number 415 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 292 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/22/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2013 | Vote to Draft |