Senate | 04/04/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2013 | Vote to Draft |