Senate | 06/04/2013 | Senate Recommitted to Public Safety and Security | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | File Number 386 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 279 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Public Hearing 03/14 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/07/2013 | Vote to Draft |