Senate | 04/10/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/05/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Vote to Draft | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2013 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |