House
|
04/01/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Public Act 13-2
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
Signed by Governor in Original
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4266
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
File Number 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 41
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/25/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/05
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|