Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Public Act 13-72
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
File Number 831
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6785
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
House Calendar Number 487
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6165
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
File Number 478
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 367
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/15
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|