Senate | 06/04/2013 | Senate Recommitted to Environment | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | File Number 479 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 361 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Public Hearing 02/15 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |