Senate | 06/03/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Public Act 13-59 | ||
Senate | 05/20/2013 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/20/2013 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | House Calendar Number 443 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/12/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | File Number 338 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 249 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Public Hearing 02/15 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |