Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Public Act 13-78
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
House Calendar Number 444
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5651
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
File Number 108
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 140
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/07
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|