Senate | 05/30/2013 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/30/2013 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/30/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/30/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/30/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | House Calendar Number 632 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | File Number 9 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 43 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/25/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/01/2013 | Public Hearing 02/05 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |