Senate | 05/17/2013 | House Calendar Number 599 | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | File Number 247 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 210 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/15/2013 | Public Hearing 02/20 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |