Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
House Calendar Number 666
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6698
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Housing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Housing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
File Number 256
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 227
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/20
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|