Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House Calendar Number 633
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 7636
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7265
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
File Number 813
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/13/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
File Number 257
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 228
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|