Senate | 06/04/2013 | Senate Recommitted to Banks | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | File Number 259 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 214 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/01/2013 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
Senate | 02/04/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |