Senate | 06/05/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/31/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/30/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Public Act 13-73 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2013 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/22/2013 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | House Calendar Number 577 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 6615 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | File Number 605 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 449 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/12/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/08/2013 | Public Hearing 02/13 | ||
Senate | 02/04/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |