Senate | 06/04/2013 | Senate Recommitted to Public Safety and Security | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | File Number 51 | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 112 | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/01/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/15/2013 | Public Hearing 02/21 | ||
Senate | 02/06/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |