Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Public Act 13-49
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
House Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
House Calendar Number 550
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
File Number 186
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 192
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/19
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|