Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Public Act 13-125
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
File Number 870
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7273
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
House Calendar Number 377
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5648
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
File Number 110
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 137
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/26
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
|
|
|