Senate | 06/04/2013 | Senate Recommitted to Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | File Number 708 | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 528 | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 04/19/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/19/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |