Senate | 06/03/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/28/2013 | Public Act 13-65 | ||
Senate | 05/21/2013 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/21/2013 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | House Calendar Number 600 | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | File Number 149 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 171 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |