1 | 1 | | General Assembly Raised Bill No. 850 |
---|
2 | 2 | | January Session, 2013 LCO No. 2606 |
---|
3 | 3 | | *02606_______HED* |
---|
4 | 4 | | Referred to Committee on HIGHER EDUCATION AND EMPLOYMENT ADVANCEMENT |
---|
5 | 5 | | Introduced by: |
---|
6 | 6 | | (HED) |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | General Assembly |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | Raised Bill No. 850 |
---|
11 | 11 | | |
---|
12 | 12 | | January Session, 2013 |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | LCO No. 2606 |
---|
15 | 15 | | |
---|
16 | 16 | | *02606_______HED* |
---|
17 | 17 | | |
---|
18 | 18 | | Referred to Committee on HIGHER EDUCATION AND EMPLOYMENT ADVANCEMENT |
---|
19 | 19 | | |
---|
20 | 20 | | Introduced by: |
---|
21 | 21 | | |
---|
22 | 22 | | (HED) |
---|
23 | 23 | | |
---|
24 | 24 | | AN ACT CONCERNING CONNECTICUT AID TO PUBLIC COLLEGE STUDENTS. |
---|
25 | 25 | | |
---|
26 | 26 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened: |
---|
27 | 27 | | |
---|
28 | 28 | | Section 1. Section 10a-164a of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2013): |
---|
29 | 29 | | |
---|
30 | 30 | | (a) The [Board of Regents for] Office of Higher Education shall annually request an appropriation [to the Office of Higher Education] equal to the amount required, for the fiscal year two years prior, for tuition waivers, tuition remissions, grants for educational expenses and student employment under subsection (f) of section 10a-77, subsection (f) of section 10a-99 and subsection (g) of section 10a-105. The office shall develop a formula for and allocate any such appropriation to The University of Connecticut, each of the Connecticut state universities and each of the regional community-technical colleges. [in accordance with a formula approved by the Board of Regents for Higher Education.] The formula shall take into account the amount of federal student aid received by students at each institution. The amounts allocated shall be used to provide grants for educational expenses and student employment for residents of the state who demonstrate substantial financial need and are enrolled as full-time or part-time matriculated students in a degree-granting program or a precollege remedial program. For each fiscal year a minimum of ten per cent of the total amount of state student financial aid appropriated to each institution which exceeds the amount received by each institution for the fiscal year ending June 30, 1987, shall be used for student financial aid for needy minority students in accordance with the board's strategic plan for racial and ethnic diversity under section 10a-11. For each fiscal year a minimum of five per cent of the total amount of state student financial aid appropriated to each institution which exceeds the amount received by each institution for the fiscal year ending June 30, 1988, shall be used for on-campus or off-campus community service work-study placements. Individual awards shall not exceed a student's calculated financial need as determined on the basis of a needs analysis system approved by the United States Department of Education. Financial aid provided to Connecticut residents under this program shall be designated as a grant from the Connecticut aid to public college students grant program. |
---|
31 | 31 | | |
---|
32 | 32 | | (b) Notwithstanding the provisions of subsection (a) of this section to the contrary, for the fiscal years ending June 30, 1989, and June 30, 1990, no institution shall have its allocation pursuant to this section reduced for the subsequent fiscal year solely because the institution did not use, for on-campus or off-campus community service work-study placements, a minimum of five per cent of the total amount of state student financial aid appropriated to the institution which exceeds the amount received by the institution for the fiscal year ending June 30, 1988. |
---|
33 | 33 | | |
---|
34 | 34 | | (c) The [Board of Regents for] Office of Higher Education shall request an appropriation [to the Office of Higher Education] for each year of the biennium equal to the amount set aside by Charter Oak State College for fee waivers in the fiscal year two years prior to the fiscal year in which such appropriation will apply. Such amount shall not exceed fifteen per cent of the tuition and fees paid in the previous fiscal year. The Office of Higher Education shall allocate any such appropriation to Charter Oak State College to be used to provide grants for educational expenses to residents of the state who demonstrate substantial financial need and who are matriculated in a degree program at Charter Oak State College. Individual awards shall not exceed a student's calculated financial need as determined by a needs analysis system approved by the United States Department of Education. |
---|
35 | 35 | | |
---|
36 | 36 | | |
---|
37 | 37 | | |
---|
38 | 38 | | |
---|
39 | 39 | | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: |
---|
40 | 40 | | Section 1 July 1, 2013 10a-164a |
---|
41 | 41 | | |
---|
42 | 42 | | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: |
---|
43 | 43 | | |
---|
44 | 44 | | Section 1 |
---|
45 | 45 | | |
---|
46 | 46 | | July 1, 2013 |
---|
47 | 47 | | |
---|
48 | 48 | | 10a-164a |
---|
49 | 49 | | |
---|
50 | 50 | | Statement of Purpose: |
---|
51 | 51 | | |
---|
52 | 52 | | To change the responsibility for the annual appropriation request and approval of the formula for the Connecticut aid to public college students grant program from the Board of Regents for Higher Education to the Office of Higher Education. |
---|
53 | 53 | | |
---|
54 | 54 | | [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.] |
---|