Senate | 06/04/2013 | Senate Recommitted to Human Services | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | File Number 760 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 539 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/07/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/08/2013 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |