Senate | 05/22/2013 | House Calendar Number 625 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7213 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | File Number 339 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 255 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/08/2013 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |