Senate | 04/04/2013 | File Number 340 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 256 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/15/2013 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |