Senate | 05/01/2013 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/19/2013 | House Calendar Number 379 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | File Number 32 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 93 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 02/15/2013 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |