Senate | 06/04/2013 | Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | File Number 21 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 61 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/04/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/08/2013 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |