Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2013
|
Special Act 13-17
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
House Calendar Number 601
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7054
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
File Number 761
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 540
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/07/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|