Senate | 05/02/2013 | House Calendar Number 489 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 5732 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule B 6030 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5672 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | File Number 436 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 308 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/05/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Public Hearing 03/14 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |