Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2013
|
Public Act 13-243
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Calendar Number 693
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8890
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
File Number 606
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 432
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/15
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|