Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Public Act 13-240
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
House Calendar Number 552
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6084
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
File Number 481
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 376
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/14
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|