Senate | 06/04/2013 | Senate Recommitted to Aging | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | No New File by Committee on Banks | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Banks | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | File Number 63 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 114 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |