Senate | 06/04/2013 | Senate Recommitted to Aging | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | File Number 261 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 226 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/15/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Labor and Public Employees | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |