Senate
|
07/11/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
Public Act 13-250
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House Calendar Number 634
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 7499
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6671
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
File Number 111
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 138
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/26
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
|
|
|