Senate
|
07/11/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
Public Act 13-252
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
House Calendar Number 680
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8303
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Banks
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Banks
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
File Number 65
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 125
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/26
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|