Senate
|
07/11/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
Public Act 13-253
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
House Calendar Number 681
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 8354
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 8306
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Senate Reconsidered
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8306
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
File Number 238
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 201
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Banks
|
|
|