Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House Calendar Number 637
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 7271
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 6702
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Matter Pass Retained
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule A 6702
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
File Number 52
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 106
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|