Senate | 05/17/2013 | House Calendar Number 602 | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6980 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | File Number 154 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 170 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |