Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Public Act 13-63
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
House Calendar Number 383
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5880
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
File Number 68
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 127
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/26
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|