House
|
07/11/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2013
|
Public Act 13-255
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Potential Disagreeing Action, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 8782
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8548
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
House Calendar Number 584
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6352
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
No New File by Committee on General Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
File Number 114
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 153
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|