House
|
07/11/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2013
|
Public Act 13-256
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
House Calendar Number 563
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 6442
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5658
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
File Number 387
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 280
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|