Senate | 03/14/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/01/2013 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |