Senate | 03/13/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |