House
|
06/04/2013
|
Potential Disagreeing Action, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 8423
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2013
|
Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,C
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule C 8423
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Bill Passed Temporarily
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule B 8312
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7910
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
House Calendar Number 585
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
File Number 264
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 222
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
|
|
|