Senate | 05/09/2013 | House Calendar Number 554 | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5578 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Senate Reconsidered | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | File Number 116 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 145 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |