Senate | 05/15/2013 | House Calendar Number 586 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | File Number 563 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 412 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/12/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Public Hearing 03/01 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |