Senate | 07/02/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/19/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/19/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/17/2013 | Special Act 13-20 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2013 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/05/2013 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 06/05/2013 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | House Calendar Number 555 | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | File Number 421 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 284 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/22/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |