Senate | 06/04/2013 | Senate Recommitted to Public Health | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | File Number 815 | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/13/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | No New File by Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | File Number 536 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 394 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Public Hearing 03/15 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |