Senate | 03/25/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/22/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |