Senate | 04/24/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | File Number 266 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 216 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/01/2013 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |