Senate | 05/29/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Public Act 13-51 | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | House Calendar Number 556 | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | File Number 488 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 372 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |